NE LB106 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to disclosure of DNA records under the DNA Identification Information Act
Title
Change provisions relating to disclosure of DNA records under the DNA Identification Information Act
Sponsors
Sen. Myron Dorn [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-13 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 17, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on August 13, 2020 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 49-0-0 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA140 withdrawn |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA140 filed |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Hunt AM3022 withdrawn |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Hunt AM3022 filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2020-02-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-03 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 28, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |