NE LB1059 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1059 amended into LB922 by AM2332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1059 amended into LB922 by AM2332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt the Judicial Resources Commission from the Open Meetings Act
Title
Exempt the Judicial Resources Commission from the Open Meetings Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Flood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1059 amended into LB922 by AM2332 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |