NE LB1058 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Faithful Delegate to Federal Article V Convention Act
Title
Adopt the Faithful Delegate to Federal Article V Convention Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Failed to advance to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2527 lost |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Chambers MO328 withdrawn |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Chambers MO328 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2527 pending |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2527 filed |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2527 |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Halloran priority bill |
2018-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34505 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1058.pdf |