NE LB1050 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB927 amended into LB1050 by AM2746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB927 amended into LB1050 by AM2746
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for identification requirements for importation of certain cattle
Title
Provide for identification requirements for importation of certain cattle
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB927 amended into LB1050 by AM2746 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-04-04 | Enrollment and Review ER282 filed | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on Select File with ER282 | |
2012-04-04 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-04-04 | Cornett AM2746 adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Cornett AM2746 filed | |
2012-04-04 | Cornett MO100 prevailed | |
2012-04-04 | Cornett MO100 Permit consideration of AM2746 filed | |
2012-04-04 | Cornett AM2181 withdrawn | |
2012-03-28 | Cornett AM2181 pending | |
2012-03-16 | Cornett AM2181 filed | |
2012-03-15 | Placed on General File | |
2012-02-16 | Cornett priority bill | |
2012-01-31 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2012 | |
2012-01-20 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15963 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1050.pdf |