NE LB1047 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions under the Nebraska Uniform Power of Attorney Act relating to banks and other financial institutions
Title
Change provisions under the Nebraska Uniform Power of Attorney Act relating to banks and other financial institutions
Sponsors
Sen. Burke Harr [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2018-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2018 |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34002 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1047.pdf |