NE LB1045 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change qualifications of certain public power district board members
Title
Change qualifications of certain public power district board members
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2624 filed |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | DeBoer AM2623 filed |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2621 filed |
2022-03-31 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2622 filed |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Bostelman AM2263 filed |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2267 filed |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | McCollister AM2275 filed |
2022-03-10 | Legislature | McCollister AM2274 filed |
2022-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2268 filed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2081 filed |
2022-03-01 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2081 |
2022-02-22 | Legislature | Natural Resources priority bill |
2022-01-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2022 |
2022-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2022-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |