NE LB1040 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redefine a term under the In the Line of Duty Compensation Act
Title
Redefine a term under the In the Line of Duty Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1040 amended into LB717 by AM2061 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-24 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2022-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 14, 2022 |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Hansen, M. name added |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |