NE LB1028 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Enrollment and Review ER201 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions relating to courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions relating to courts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Legislature - Judiciary AM2525 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER201 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER201
2020-03-09LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-09LegislatureJudiciary AM2525 adopted
2020-02-27LegislatureJudiciary AM2525 filed
2020-02-27LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2525
2020-02-25LegislatureSpeaker priority bill
2020-01-28LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 05, 2020
2020-01-22LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2020-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback