NE LB1027 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to schools which elect not to meet accreditation and approval requirements
Title
Change provisions relating to schools which elect not to meet accreditation and approval requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Education AM2440 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Clements AM3075 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Conrad AM2677 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Education AM2440 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Clements AM3075 adopted (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Legislature - Conrad AM2677 adopted (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 44-1-4 |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER106 adopted |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER106 filed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER106 |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Education AM2440 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements AM3075 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements FA295 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Conrad AM2677 adopted |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements MO1268 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements MO1267 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements MO1266 withdrawn |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Clements AM3075 to AM2440 filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Clements MO1268 Recommit to the Education Committee filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Clements MO1267 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Clements MO1266 Bracket until April 11, 2024 filed |
2024-03-15 | Legislature | Clements FA295 to AM2440 filed |
2024-02-23 | Legislature | Conrad AM2677 to AM2440 filed |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Education AM2440 filed |
2024-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2440 |
2024-02-20 | Legislature | Speaker priority bill |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Halloran name added |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |