NE LB1023 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change sunset dates on certain tax incentive programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change sunset dates on certain tax incentive programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-02-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 27, 2018
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback