NE LB1022 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Irrigation Tax Act and change the valuation of agricultural land for property tax purposes
Title
Adopt the Irrigation Tax Act and change the valuation of agricultural land for property tax purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34038 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1022.pdf |