NE LB1020 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to limits on indebtedness from direct borrowing by cities and villages
Title
Change provisions relating to limits on indebtedness from direct borrowing by cities and villages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1806 filed |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1806 |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34625 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1020.pdf |