NE LB102 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change references from Big Twelve to Big Ten Conference in provisions requiring a stipend or restricting hours of participation for intercollegiate athletes
Title
Change references from Big Twelve to Big Ten Conference in provisions requiring a stipend or restricting hours of participation for intercollegiate athletes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on March 07, 2019 |
2019-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne explanation of vote |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 01, 2019 |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2019-03-01 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2019-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2019-02-11 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2019-02-07 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2019-02-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2019-01-18 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |