NE LB1017 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1017 amended into LB707 by AM1859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1017 amended into LB707 by AM1859
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Uniform Trust Code
Title
Change provisions relating to the Nebraska Uniform Trust Code
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Slama [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1017 amended into LB707 by AM1859 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2022 |
2022-01-19 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |