NE LB1017 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Bill withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change and eliminate pipeline siting provisions and eminent domain provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change and eliminate pipeline siting provisions and eminent domain provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24LegislatureBill withdrawn
2018-01-24LegislatureKrist MO178 prevailed
2018-01-19LegislatureKrist MO178 Withdraw bill filed
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Natural Resources Committee
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback