NE LB1014 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Name the Discriminatory Wage Practices Act, change provisions relating to wage discrimination on the basis of sex, and provide protections for employees relating to wage disclosure
Title
Name the Discriminatory Wage Practices Act, change provisions relating to wage discrimination on the basis of sex, and provide protections for employees relating to wage disclosure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34601 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1014.pdf |