NE LB1012 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for funds transfers, create funds, and change and eliminate provisions regarding funds and reimbursement provisions
Title
Provide for funds transfers, create funds, and change and eliminate provisions regarding funds and reimbursement provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Legislature - Stinner MO218 prevailed (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-6-9 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Friesen AM2349 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Bostelman FA149 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Stinner MO180 prevailed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Friesen AM2576 lost (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 26 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2000 adopted (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Stinner MO157 prevailed (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-6-9 (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Friesen AM2349 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Bostelman FA149 adopted (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Stinner MO180 prevailed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Legislature - Friesen AM2576 lost (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 26 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2000 adopted (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Legislature - Stinner MO157 prevailed (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1114 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1090 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1074 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB911 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB759 amended into LB1012 by AM2000 |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Certificate |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Communication |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Passed notwithstanding objections of Governor 42-3-4 |
2022-04-07 | Legislature | Stinner MO218 prevailed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Geist explanation of vote |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Stinner MO218 To override the Governor's line-item veto contained in the following section of the bill: Section 28, transfer of funds from the Prison Overcrowding Contingency Fund to the Vocational and Life Skills Programming Fund filed |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Appropriations Committee Report |
2022-04-05 | Legislature | Approved by Governor with line-item veto on April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 34-6-9 |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2510 withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2541 withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Aguilar AM2425 withdrawn |
2022-03-29 | Legislature | Arch AM2389 withdrawn |
2022-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | McDonnell AM2510 filed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2349 adopted |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Bostelman FA149 adopted |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Stinner MO180 prevailed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Stinner MO180 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Bostelman FA149 filed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 withdrawn |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 pending |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2351 withdrawn |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2576 lost |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen AM2576 filed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen FA147 withdrawn |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Friesen FA147 filed |
2022-03-24 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 adopted |
2022-03-23 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2541 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Aguilar AM2425 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER148 filed |
2022-03-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER148 |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Arch AM2389 filed |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 refiled |
2022-03-16 | Legislature | Friesen AM2349 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2351 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2000 adopted |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Stinner MO157 prevailed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Stinner MO157 Invoke cloture pursuant to Rule 7, Sec. 10 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne MO158 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne MO158 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne AM2382 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne AM2382 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA129 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA129 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA127 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne FA127 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne AM2360 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Wayne AM2360 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2345 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2345 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 withdrawn |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2000 pending |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 pending |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Friesen AM2344 filed |
2022-03-15 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2000 pending |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2000 filed |
2022-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2000 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2022 |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2022-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |