NE LB1012 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 17, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorize self-service storage facility operator insurance producer licenses

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorize self-service storage facility operator insurance producer licenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-11 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 17, 2018
2018-04-11LegislatureThibodeau explanation of vote
2018-04-11LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 11, 2018
2018-04-11LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-11LegislaturePassed on Final Reading 45-0-4
2018-04-06LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST58
2018-04-04LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-04-04LegislatureHarr AM2706 adopted
2018-04-04LegislatureHarr AM2706 filed
2018-04-04LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER155 adopted
2018-03-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER155 filed
2018-03-28LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER155
2018-03-26LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-26LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 adopted
2018-02-07LegislatureBanking, Commerce and Insurance AM1691 filed
2018-02-07LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1691
2018-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2018
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback