NE LB1011 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1011 amended into LB909 by AM2687
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide a duty for drivers approaching certain stopped vehicles on a roadway as prescribed under the Nebraska Rules of the Road

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide a duty for drivers approaching certain stopped vehicles on a roadway as prescribed under the Nebraska Rules of the Road

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB1011 amended into LB909 by AM2687
2018-04-18LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2018-03-12LegislaturePlaced on General File
2018-02-01LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 12, 2018
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback