NE LB101 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Title printed. Carryover bill
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for an exemption from the Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act for certain agricultural operations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for an exemption from the Nebraska Workers’ Compensation Act for certain agricultural operations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1935 filed
2023-05-23LegislatureHunt AM1934 filed
2023-02-02LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 13, 2023
2023-01-23LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2023 (cancel)
2023-01-20LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 30, 2023
2023-01-10LegislatureReferred to Business and Labor Committee
2023-01-06LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback