NE LB1009 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1009 amended into LB1215 by AM2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Nonpartisan
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Provisions/portions of LB1009 amended into LB1215 by AM2549
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Barber Act
Title
Change provisions of the Barber Act
Sponsors
Sen. Lynne Walz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1009 amended into LB1215 by AM2549 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2024 |
2024-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |