NE LB1009 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB826 amended into LB1009 by AM2738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB826 amended into LB1009 by AM2738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for, change, and eliminate fund transfers, change use of funds, and eliminate a fund
Title
Provide for, change, and eliminate fund transfers, change use of funds, and eliminate a fund
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-2-1 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Scheer MO197 prevailed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Wayne MO194 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Stinner AM3120 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Scheer MO176 prevailed (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Chambers MO175 failed (Y: 2 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Wayne AM2919 lost (Y: 3 N: 22 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Wayne FA113 lost (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2738 adopted (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Scheer MO197 prevailed (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Wayne MO194 failed (Y: 1 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-07-28 - Legislature - Stinner AM3120 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Scheer MO176 prevailed (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Chambers MO175 failed (Y: 2 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Wayne AM2919 lost (Y: 3 N: 22 NV: 16 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Wayne FA113 lost (Y: 5 N: 24 NV: 11 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2738 adopted (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB826 amended into LB1009 by AM2738 |
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-2-1 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Wayne MO195 withdrawn |
2020-07-29 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST66 |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO195 Bracket until August 13, 2020 filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Scheer MO197 prevailed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Scheer MO197 Invoke cloture filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO194 failed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Wayne MO194 Recommit to the Appropriations Committee filed |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Stinner AM3120 adopted |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Stinner AM3120 pending |
2020-07-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 adopted |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Stinner AM3120 filed |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Speaker Major Proposal |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER204 filed |
2020-03-23 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER204 |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Scheer MO176 prevailed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Scheer MO176 Invoke cloture filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers MO175 failed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers MO175 Bracket until April 22, 2020 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Wayne AM2919 lost |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Wayne AM2919 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Wayne FA113 lost |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Wayne FA113 filed |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2738 adopted |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Appropriations AM2738 filed |
2020-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2738 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |