NE LB1008 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Linehan AM2951 filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Appropriations AM2737 adopted (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Scheer FA110 lost (Y: 2 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Scheer MO174 prevailed (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Chambers MO173 failed (Y: 2 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Chambers MO172 failed (Y: 1 N: 30 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Chambers MO171 failed (Y: 0 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2020-03-12 - Legislature - Stinner AM2911 adopted (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23LegislatureLinehan AM2951 filed
2020-03-23LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER210 filed
2020-03-23LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER210
2020-03-12LegislatureStinner AM2936 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2905 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2904 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2903 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2902 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2901 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne AM2900 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2020-03-12LegislatureAppropriations AM2737 adopted
2020-03-12LegislatureScheer FA110 lost
2020-03-12LegislatureScheer MO174 prevailed
2020-03-12LegislatureScheer MO174 Invoke cloture filed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO173 failed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO173 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO172 failed
2020-03-12LegislatureKolowski objected to unanimous consent to withdraw MO172
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO172 Reconsider the vote to bracket filed
2020-03-12LegislatureLa Grone AM2929 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO171 failed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO171 Bracket until April 22, 2020 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne MO170 withdrawn
2020-03-12LegislatureWayne MO170 Recommit to the Appropriations Committee filed
2020-03-12LegislatureScheer FA110 pending
2020-03-12LegislatureScheer FA110 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO169 withdrawn
2020-03-12LegislatureChambers MO169 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed
2020-03-12LegislatureLinehan AM2916 withdrawn
2020-03-12LegislatureLinehan AM2916 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureStinner AM2911 adopted
2020-03-12LegislatureStinner AM2911 pending
2020-03-12LegislatureStinner AM2911 filed
2020-03-12LegislatureAppropriations AM2737 pending
2020-03-11LegislatureSlama AM2884 filed
2020-03-10LegislatureAppropriations AM2737 filed
2020-03-10LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2737
2020-01-21LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 29, 2020
2020-01-21LegislatureReferred to Appropriations Committee
2020-01-15LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback