NE LB1008 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1008 amended into LB934 by AM2190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Provisions/portions of LB1008 amended into LB934 by AM2190
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide qualification requirements for guardians ad litem in guardianship, conservatorship, and other protective proceedings
Title
Provide qualification requirements for guardians ad litem in guardianship, conservatorship, and other protective proceedings
Sponsors
Sen. Colby Coash [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1008 amended into LB934 by AM2190 |
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-01-27 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016 |
2016-01-20 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28068 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB1008.pdf |