NE LB1005 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB700 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change retirement provisions and University Trust Fund investment provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change retirement provisions and University Trust Fund investment provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB700 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB699 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB698 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
2018-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB548 amended into LB1005 by AM2204
2018-04-23LegislatureApproved by Governor on April 23, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresented to Governor on April 18, 2018
2018-04-18LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2018-04-18LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
2018-04-18LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2018-04-03LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST51
2018-03-28LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2018-03-28LegislatureKolterman AM2560 adopted
2018-03-28LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER137 adopted
2018-03-21LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER137 filed
2018-03-21LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER137
2018-03-21LegislatureKolterman AM2560 filed
2018-03-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2018-03-20LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems AM2204 adopted
2018-03-06LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems AM2204 filed
2018-03-06LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM2204
2018-02-07LegislatureNebraska Retirement Systems priority bill
2018-01-22LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 02, 2018
2018-01-18LegislatureReferred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
2018-01-16LegislatureDate of introduction
2018-01-16LegislatureKolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill prevailed
2018-01-11LegislatureKolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill filed

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback