NE LB1004 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB793 by AM2871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB793 by AM2871
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for aging and disability resource centers as prescribed and eliminate references to demonstration projects
Title
Provide for aging and disability resource centers as prescribed and eliminate references to demonstration projects
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Bolz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1004 amended into LB793 by AM2871 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 07, 2018 |
2018-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34116 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB1004.pdf |