NE LB1001 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB1131 by AM2638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB1131 by AM2638
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require suicide prevention phone numbers on student identification cards
Title
Require suicide prevention phone numbers on student identification cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1001 amended into LB1131 by AM2638 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Hunt name added |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Blood name added |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2020-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40838 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB1001.pdf |