NE LB10 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Brewer name added
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change motor vehicle and property tax exemptions for disabled veterans

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change motor vehicle and property tax exemptions for disabled veterans

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-24LegislatureBrewer name added
2024-01-03LegislatureTitle printed. Carryover bill
2023-03-06LegislatureHoldcroft name added
2023-02-07LegislatureAguilar name added
2023-01-30LegislatureHunt name added
2023-01-18LegislatureNotice of hearing for January 26, 2023
2023-01-13LegislatureDay name added
2023-01-10LegislatureConrad name added
2023-01-09LegislatureReferred to Revenue Committee
2023-01-05LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback