NE LB10 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change motor vehicle and property tax exemptions for disabled veterans
Title
Change motor vehicle and property tax exemptions for disabled veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2021-01-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 29, 2021 |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Murman name added |
2021-01-13 | Legislature | Lindstrom name added |
2021-01-12 | Legislature | Day name added |
2021-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2021-01-08 | Legislature | Gragert name added |
2021-01-07 | Legislature | Date of introduction |