ND SCR4018 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading, failed to adopt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of implementing a paid family leave program in the state, including consideration of possible eligibility requirements, applicable uses, employer participation, and cost and benefit structures for a paid family leave program.
Title
A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to consider studying the feasibility and desirability of implementing a paid family leave program in the state, including consideration of possible eligibility requirements, applicable uses, employer participation, and cost and benefit structures for a paid family leave program.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Cleary [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Josh Christy [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] |
Rep. Zachary Ista [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to adopt |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Reported back without recommendation 6 0 0 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:55 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to State and Local Government |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/bill-overview/bo4018.html |
Text | https://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-3086-01000.pdf |