ND SCR4017 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A concurrent resolution urging the Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency to fully reinstate, and strictly abide by the October 17, 2017, memorandum titled Adhering to the Fundamental Principles of Due Process, Rule of Law, and Cooperative Federalism in Consent Decrees and Settlement Agreements; to promulgate and enforce only environmental regulations that appropriately take into account public and private fiscal impacts as well as the nation's continuing food security and energy security; and to defer to and work together in good faith with all sovereign states in the spirit of cooperative federalism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A concurrent resolution urging the Administrator of the United States Environmental Protection Agency to fully reinstate, and strictly abide by the October 17, 2017, memorandum titled Adhering to the Fundamental Principles of Due Process, Rule of Law, and Cooperative Federalism in Consent Decrees and Settlement Agreements; to promulgate and enforce only environmental regulations that appropriately take into account public and private fiscal impacts as well as the nation's continuing food security and energy security; and to defer to and work together in good faith with all sovereign states in the spirit of cooperative federalism.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/11
2023-04-11SenateSigned by President
2023-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-07SenateSecond reading, adopted
2023-04-07SenateConcurred
2023-03-24SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-03-22SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-03-21HouseSecond reading, adopted
2023-03-20HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-03-17HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2023-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-08HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2023-03-08HouseReceived from Senate
2023-03-07SenateSecond reading, adopted
2023-03-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2023-03-02SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback