ND SB2371 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Froelich, Kilichowski, Kingsbury A BILL for an Act to provide for the control of invasive species; to amend and reenact sections 63-01.1-06 and 63-01.1-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to amend and reenact section 16 of House Bill No. 1026, as approved by the sixty-first legislative assembly, relating to the distribution of state appropriations for noxious weed control.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Froelich, Kilichowski, Kingsbury A BILL for an Act to provide for the control of invasive species; to amend and reenact sections 63-01.1-06 and 63-01.1-07.6 of the North Dakota Century Code or in the alternative to amend and reenact section 16 of House Bill No. 1026, as approved by the sixty-first legislative assembly, relating to the distribution of state appropriations for noxious weed control.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. Tim Flakoll [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 001 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (House recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Conf comm appointed Uglem Wall Mueller | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Miller Wanzek Behm | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-19 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 091 nays 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-02-12 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-11 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-02-09 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-06 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-01-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2371.html |