ND SB2368 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Conklin, DeKrey, Kingsbury, Onstad A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 17 of section 4-22-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the mill levy limit for soil conservation districts; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Conklin, DeKrey, Kingsbury, Onstad A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 17 of section 4-22-26 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the mill levy limit for soil conservation districts; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-19 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Motion to reconsider failed | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 049 nays 044 | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 003 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation | |
2009-02-18 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 026 nays 021 | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 004 n 003 | |
2009-02-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2368.html |