ND 2365 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the laws relating to the humane treatment of animals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of the laws relating to the humane treatment of animals.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-01 Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 36 nays 56
2011-03-25 Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0
2011-03-18 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-02-24 Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
2011-02-23 Received from Senate
2011-02-22 Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
2011-02-21 Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2011-02-11 Committee Hearing 09:00
2011-01-25 Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback