ND SB2364 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 61-24 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Garrison Diversion Conservancy District and permanent easements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Garrison Diversion Conservancy District and permanent easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/13
2023-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2023-04-11SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-11SenateSigned by President
2023-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1
2023-04-06SenateConcurred
2023-03-29SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-03-28HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
2023-03-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-03-24HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 0 5
2023-03-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-14HouseRereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2023-03-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2023-03-10HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2023-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 02:15
2023-02-21HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2023-02-20HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-02-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-17SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2023-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-02-03SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/bill-overview/bo2364.html
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-02000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-03000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-04000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-05000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-06000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-03002a.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-1091-03001a.pdf
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-32.pdf#Page662
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/hr-dailyjnl-53.pdf#Page1386
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-60.pdf#Page1455

Bill Comments

feedback