ND SB2362 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-51.1-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the allocation of oil extraction tax; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The allocation of oil extraction tax; to provide a contingent appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to provide an effective date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Jeff Delzer [R] |
Rep. Craig Headland [R] | Rep. Chet Pollert [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-04-05 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 17 3 1 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported back, do pass 12 0 2 |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Finance and Taxation Committee |