ND SB2340 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 48
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15.1-06-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to required school counselors; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Required school counselors; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Axtman [R] | Sen. Jay Elkin [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Rep. Glenn Bosch [R] |
Rep. Dori Hauck [R] | Rep. Patrick Heinert [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 40 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 48 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 03:59 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |
2023-02-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:35 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Education |