ND SB2237 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-17 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a child care income tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A child care income tax credit; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Sean Cleary [R] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] | Rep. Liz Conmy [D] |
Rep. Hamida Dakane [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 78 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-17 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 78 |
2023-03-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 03:26 |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |
2023-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 7 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 1 0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 14 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:40 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:50 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:12 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Finance and Taxation |