ND SB2226 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 16.1-06-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the required form for measures to amend the constitution and the manner of placing the measures on ballots.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The required form for measures to amend the constitution and the manner of placing the measures on ballots.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 6 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-13HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 87
2023-03-09HouseReported back, do not pass, place on calendar 13 0 0
2023-03-09HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Government and Veterans Affairs
2023-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 25 nays 22
2023-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 1 1
2023-02-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 04:55
2023-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 09:45
2023-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-18SenateRereferred to State and Local Government
2023-01-18SenateRequest return from committee
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback