ND SB2219 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 39-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to civil judgment for nonpayment of statutory fees; to amend and reenact section 14-08.1-07, subsection 6 of section 39-06-19, section 39-06-32, subsection 4 of section 39-06-33, subdivision i of subsection 2 of section 39-06-49, subsection 5 of section 39-06.1-11, and subsection 2 of section 39-16-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to suspension of an operator's license for nonpayment of child support, the issuance of a temporary permit, authority to suspend an operator's license for failure to pay a fine, hearings on suspension or revocation of license, license reinstatement fees, temporary restricted licenses, and entries on driver's record abstract; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Suspension of an operator's license for nonpayment of child support, the issuance of a temporary permit, authority to suspend an operator's license for failure to pay a fine, hearings on suspension or revocation of license, license reinstatement fees, temporary restricted licenses, and entries on driver's record abstract; to provide for a legislative management study; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 47
2023-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2023-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2023-04-19HouseConference committee appointed Koppelman Grueneich Dobervich
2023-04-17SenateConference committee appointed Conley Paulson Clemens
2023-04-17SenateRefused to concur
2023-04-11SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-04-11HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 8
2023-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-04-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2023-04-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2023-03-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-03-03HouseRereferred to Transportation
2023-03-03HouseRequest return from committee
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-02-15HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-14SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0
2023-02-13SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-10SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 0
2023-02-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-01-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-18SenateRereferred to Transportation
2023-01-18SenateRequest return from committee
2023-01-17SenateRereferred to Human Services
2023-01-17SenateRequest return from committee
2023-01-12SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback