ND SB2211 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
The offense of driving without liability insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/13 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-09 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 13 |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2015-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |