ND SB2210 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-04 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 59-09-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to individual retirement and employee benefit trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual retirement and employee benefit trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-04SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/30
2023-03-30SenateSigned by Governor 03/29
2023-03-24SenateSent to Governor
2023-03-24SenateSigned by President
2023-03-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-23SenateReturned to Senate
2023-03-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2023-03-21HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2023-03-20HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor
2023-02-03HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-02SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2023-02-01SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
2023-01-31SenateCommittee Hearing 09:35
2023-01-30SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-01-11SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback