ND SB2207 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new subsection to section 57-38-30.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the effect of the expiration of the federal research tax credit on the state income tax credit for research and experimental expenditures; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The effect of the expiration of the federal research tax credit on the state income tax credit for research and experimental expenditures; to provide for retroactive application; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Grindberg [R] | Sen. Ray Holmberg [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] |
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Blair Thoreson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2013-04-10 | House | Conference committee appointed Hatlestad Trottier S. Kelsh |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Oehlke Campbell Triplett |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 7 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 2 |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |