ND SB2194 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 4.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a postproduction royalty oversight program; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 38-08-04.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; and to provide a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; and to provide a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-17SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/13
2023-04-13SenateSigned by Governor 04/12
2023-04-12SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-12SenateSigned by President
2023-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-10SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6
2023-04-10SenateConcurred
2023-04-06SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-04-06HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 5
2023-04-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 2
2023-04-05HouseCommittee Hearing 11:15
2023-04-03HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2023-04-03HouseAmendment adopted
2023-03-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2023-03-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2023-03-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-22HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2023-02-22HouseReceived from Senate
2023-02-21SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 35 nays 11
2023-02-21SenateAmendment adopted
2023-02-21SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2023-02-17SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 16 0 0
2023-02-17SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-16SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2023-02-15SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-02-06SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2023-02-06SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-02-03SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 0 2
2023-02-02SenateCommittee Hearing 09:15
2023-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 10:25
2023-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2023-01-10SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/bill-overview/bo2194.html
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-01000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-02000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-03000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-04000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-05000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-03001a.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-0490-01001a.pdf
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-34.pdf#Page816
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/hr-dailyjnl-60.pdf#Page1663
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-62.pdf#Page1515

Bill Comments

feedback