ND SB2183 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsections
Title
Qualifications of individuals circulating initiated or referred measure and recall petitions; and to provide for application.
Sponsors
Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Rich Wardner [R] | Rep. Al Carlson [R] | Rep. Larry Bellew [R] |
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Mike Nathe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 9 nays 83 |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 4 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 16 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |