ND SB2168 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 39-06.1-06, subdivision i of subsection 1 of section 39-09-02, section 39-21-41.4, and subsection 2 of section 40-05-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to speeding violations, use of safety belts, and city fines and penalties; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speeding violations, use of safety belts, and city fines and penalties; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 8 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-25SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 8 nays 39
2023-04-25SenateConference committee report adopted
2023-04-24SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2023-04-19HouseConference committee appointed Koppelman Timmons Weisz
2023-04-17SenateConference committee appointed Rummel Larsen Clemens
2023-04-17SenateRefused to concur
2023-04-10SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-04-10HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 66 nays 24
2023-04-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-04-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0
2023-04-06HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-31HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-03-24HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2023-03-23HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2023-03-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:30
2023-03-03HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-02-17HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation
2023-01-24HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-23SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 34 nays 13
2023-01-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 0
2023-01-20SenateCommittee Hearing 10:55
2023-01-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-09SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Transportation

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback