ND SB2128 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a certified community behavioral health clinic grant program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a certified community behavioral health clinic grant program.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 15 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 75 |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 03:21 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 38 nays 9 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 16 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 05:03 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:50 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:25 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |