ND SB2125 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-01 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 21 of section 4-09-01, subsection 1 of section 4-09-02, subsection 2 of section 4-09-03, and sections 4-09-13, 4-09-17.1, 4-09-25, and 4-11-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the seed department's revolving fund and to the functions and responsibilities of the seed commission and the seed department.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 21 of section 4-09-01, subsection 1 of section 4-09-02, subsection 2 of section 4-09-03, and sections 4-09-13, 4-09-17.1, 4-09-25, and 4-11-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the seed department's revolving fund and to the functions and responsibilities of the seed commission and the seed department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-01 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 001 | |
2009-04-23 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-21 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate accede) | |
2009-04-15 | Conf comm appointed Uglem Kingsbury Mueller | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Wanzek Miller Heckaman | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-01 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 086 nays 000 | |
2009-03-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-20 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture | |
2009-01-20 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-19 | Second reading, passed, yeas 042 nays 000 | |
2009-01-16 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-15 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2125.html |