ND SB2092 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to voluntary liquidation of credit unions; to amend and reenact section 6-01-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the removal of officers, directors, and employees of financial corporations or institutions; and to repeal chapter 6-06.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to voluntary liquidation of credit unions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voluntary liquidation of credit unions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 04/26
2023-04-26SenateSigned by Governor 04/25
2023-04-24SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-24SenateSigned by President
2023-04-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-04-21HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 91 nays 0
2023-04-21HouseConference committee report adopted
2023-04-19HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2023-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2023-04-17SenateConference committee report adopted
2023-04-17SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2023-04-13HouseConference committee appointed Ostlie Warrey Wagner
2023-04-07SenateConference committee appointed Barta Larsen Klein
2023-04-07SenateRefused to concur
2023-03-14SenateReturned to Senate (12)
2023-03-13HouseSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0
2023-03-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-03-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2023-03-07HouseCommittee Hearing 11:02
2023-03-01HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-02-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor
2023-01-09HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-06SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0
2023-01-06SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0
2023-01-04SenateCommittee Hearing 11:15
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/bill-overview/bo2092.html
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-01000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-02000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-03000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-04000.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-01001a.pdf
Texthttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/documents/23-8092-01002a.pdf
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-02.pdf#Page147
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/hr-dailyjnl-42.pdf#Page1190
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf#Page1695
Roll Callhttps://ndlegis.gov/assembly/68-2023/regular/journals/hr-dailyjnl-69.pdf#Page2189

Bill Comments

feedback