ND SB2084 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 50-06-06.11, 50-33-01, 50-33-06, and 50-33-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child care assistance payments to providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care assistance payments to providers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-24SenateFiled with Secretary Of State 03/15
2023-03-15SenateSigned by Governor 03/14
2023-03-14SenateSent to Governor
2023-03-09SenateSigned by President
2023-03-09HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-03-08SenateReturned to Senate
2023-03-07HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
2023-03-06HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
2023-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 11:14
2023-03-06HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2023-02-15HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services
2023-01-16HouseReceived from Senate
2023-01-13SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2023-01-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2023-01-11SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2023-01-10SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2023-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 02:50
2023-01-09SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2023-01-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred to Human Services

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback